WI SB63 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-24 - Published 4-24-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-24 - Published 4-24-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 15.105 (5) of the statutes; Relating to: the composition of the State Capitol and Executive Residence Board.
Title
The composition of the State Capitol and Executive Residence Board.
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Risser [D] | Sen. Dale Schultz [R] | Sen. Luther Olsen [R] | Rep. Amy Loudenbeck [R] |
Sen. Duey Stroebel [R] | Rep. Gordon Hintz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-24 | Senate | Published 4-24-2014 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-23-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 331 |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-22-2014 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2014-03-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-18 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2014-03-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-03-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-18 | House | Read a second time |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on calendar 3-18-2014 by Committee on Rules |
2014-02-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-02-20 | House | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2014-02-17 | House | Executive action taken |
2014-02-17 | House | Public hearing held |
2014-01-15 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on State Affairs and Government Operations |
2014-01-15 | House | Received from Senate |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-14-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2013-11-06 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2013-11-06 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Public Works, and Telecommunications, Ayes 6, Noes 1 |
2013-11-06 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2013-08-14 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Public Works, and Telecommunications |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |