WI SB629 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 238.137 of the statutes; Relating to: a shovel-ready workforce housing development site program. (FE)
Title
A shovel-ready workforce housing development site program. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Feyen [R] | Rep. Alex Dallman [R] | Rep. David Armstrong [R] | Rep. Barbara Dittrich [R] |
Rep. Joel Kitchens [R] | Rep. Clint Moses [R] | Rep. James Edming [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | Senate | Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar 5-17-2022 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a) |
2022-04-15 | Senate | Report vetoed by the Governor on 4-15-2022 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-14-2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2022-02-24 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-24 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2022-02-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-24 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-24 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-23 | House | Made a special order of business at 8:04 AM on 2-24-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 30 |
2022-02-23 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-23 | House | Received from Senate |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-22-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Economic and Workforce Development, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Economic and Workforce Development, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Feyen |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-11-11 | Senate | Representative Murphy added as a cosponsor |
2021-10-28 | Senate | LRB correction |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Representative Krug added as a cosponsor |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic and Workforce Development |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Introduced |