WI SB628 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 973.046 (1r) (a), 973.046 (1r) (b) and 973.047 (1f) of the statutes; Relating to: deoxyribonucleic acid analysis surcharges. (FE)
Title
Deoxyribonucleic acid analysis surcharges. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Feyen [R] | Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] | Sen. Duey Stroebel [R] | Sen. Robert Wirch [D] |
Rep. David Bowen [D] | Rep. Michael Schraa [R] | Rep. Donna Rozar [R] | Rep. Marisabel Cabrera [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Introduced |