WI SB628 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Published 3-31-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Published 3-31-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 153.05 (8) (b), 153.46 (1) (c) (intro.), 153.50 (3) (b) 1. and 153.50 (6) (a); and to create 153.46 (7), 153.46 (8), 153.50 (1) (b) 1r. and 153.50 (6) (am) of the statutes; Relating to: collection of health care information.
Title
Collection of health care information.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | Senate | Published 3-31-2016 |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-30-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 287 |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-29-2016 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2016-02-16 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-16 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2016-02-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-16 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-16 | House | Read a second time |
2016-02-16 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2016-02-11 | House | Placed on calendar 2-16-2016 by Committee on Rules |
2016-02-11 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2016-02-09 | House | Received from Senate |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senator Cowles added as a coauthor |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Read a second time |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-9-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Senator Harris Dodd added as a coauthor |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced |