WI SB622 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal and recreate 3.11 to 3.18 of the statutes; Relating to: congressional redistricting.
Title
Congressional redistricting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-11 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-08 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-08 - Senate - Senate: Refused to adopt Senate Substitute Amendment 1 (Y: 11 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-11-08 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-08 - Senate - Senate: Refused to adopt Senate Substitute Amendment 1 (Y: 11 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | Senate | Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar 5-17-2022 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a) |
2021-11-18 | Senate | Report vetoed by the Governor on 11-18-2021 |
2021-11-16 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 11-16-2021 |
2021-11-15 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2021-11-12 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2021-11-11 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-11-11 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 60, Noes 38 |
2021-11-11 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-11-11 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-11-11 | House | Read a second time |
2021-11-11 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2021-11-09 | House | Placed on calendar 11-11-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-11-09 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2021-11-08 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 21, Noes 12 |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Refused to adopt Senate Substitute Amendment 1, Ayes 11, Noes 22 |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Placed on the foot of the 11th order of business on the calendar of 11-8-2021 |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senators Bewley, Erpenbach, Ringhand, Roys and Wirch |
2021-11-05 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-8-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-11-04 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-11-04 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2021-11-04 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Introduced |