WI SB622 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 846.16 (1); and to create 846.155 of the statutes; Relating to: eligible bidders at foreclosure sales, eligible purchasers of foreclosed property, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Eligible bidders at foreclosure sales, eligible purchasers of foreclosed property, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Rereferred to committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Constitution and Federalism, by the Senate President, pursuant to Senate Rule 20(1)(c) |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Representative Vruwink added as a cosponsor |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Olsen |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Olsen |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance, Housing and Trade |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb622 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB622.pdf |