WI SB621 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 66.1105 (20) (c) 2. of the statutes; Relating to: increasing the expenditure period for certain capital expenditures made by a tax incremental financing district created in an electronics and information technology manufacturing zone. (FE)
Title
Increasing the expenditure period for certain capital expenditures made by a tax incremental financing district created in an electronics and information technology manufacturing zone. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Trade, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Trade |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb621 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB621.pdf |