WI SB620 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 16.968 and 281.34 (9); to renumber 160.50 (2); to renumber and amend 20.865 (2) (em), 196.03 (3) (a) and 281.34 (7); to amend 20.370 (6) (eg), 196.03 (3) (b) 1., 281.34 (1) (f), 281.34 (4) (a) 2., 281.34 (4) (a) 3., 281.34 (5) (b) 1., 281.34 (5) (c), 281.34 (5) (d), 281.344 (4s) (dm), 281.344 (4s) (dm), 281.346 (4s) (dm), 281.346 (4s) (dm), 281.348 (3) (c) 8. and 281.348 (3) (cm); and to create 36.25 (6) (f), 145.133, 160.50 (2) (b), 196.03 (3) (ag), 196.03 (3) (c), 281.34 (1) (eg), 281.34 (1) (er), 281.34 (4) (a) 4., 281.34 (4) (a) 5., 281.34 (4) (am), 281.34 (5) (dc), 281.34 (5) (de), 281.34 (5) (ds), 281.34 (7) (c), 281.34 (7) (d), 281.34 (11), 281.341, 281.346 (8) (cm), 281.346 (8) (cs), 281.348 (3) (a) 3. and 4. and 281.348 (3) (d) 4m. of the statutes; relating to: groundwater management, water conservation, and granting rule-making authority.
Title
Groundwater management, water conservation, and granting rule-making authority.
Sponsors
Rep. Terese Berceau [D] | Rep. Spencer Black [D] | Rep. Fred Clark [D] | Rep. Kristen Dexter [D] |
Rep. Jason Fields [D] | Rep. Gary Hebl [D] | Rep. Thomas Hixson [D] | Sen. Bob Jauch [D] |
Sen. John Lehman [D] | Rep. Cory Mason [D] | Sen. Mark Miller [D] | Rep. Nick Milroy [D] |
Rep. Joseph Parisi [D] | Rep. Sandra Pasch [D] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D] | Rep. Sondy Pope [D] |
Sen. Fred Risser [D] | Sen. Judith Robson [D] | Sen. Kelda Roys [D] | Sen. Jeff Smith [D] |
Rep. James Soletski [D] | Rep. Annette Williams [D] | Rep. Josh Zepnick [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-04-20 | Senate substitute amendment 1 offered by Senator Kedzie | |
2010-04-02 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-04-02 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-04-02 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-04-02 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-03-31 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-03-23 | Public hearing held | |
2010-03-17 | Senator Taylor added as a coauthor | |
2010-03-16 | LRB correction | |
2010-03-15 | Read first time and referred to committee on Environment | |
2010-03-15 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb620 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/SB620.pdf |