WI SB62 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Published 6-2-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Published 6-2-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 119.13, 120.07 and 120.45 of the statutes; Relating to: authorizing a school board member to refuse his or her salary. (FE)
Title
Authorizing a school board member to refuse his or her salary. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Senate | Published 6-2-2017 |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 6-1-2017. 2017 Wisconsin Act 9 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 5-31-2017 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | LRB correction (Senate Amendment 1) |
2017-05-31 | Senate | LRB correction |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2017-05-02 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-05-02 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 98, Noes 0 |
2017-05-02 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-05-02 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-05-02 | House | Read a second time |
2017-05-02 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2017-04-27 | House | Placed on calendar 5-2-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-04-11 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2017-04-04 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Read a second time |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Placed on calendar 4-4-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Marklein |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Local Government, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Local Government |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Introduced |