WI SB617 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Vetoed on March 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-14 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on March 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-14 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 341.13 (5); and to create 341.13 (1m) and 341.13 (5) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: indicia of registration for electric vehicles. (FE)
Title
Indicia of registration for electric vehicles. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-14 | Senate | Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82 |
2024-05-13 | Senate | Placed on calendar 5-14-2024 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a) |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Report vetoed by the Governor on 3-29-2024 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-26-2024 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2024-02-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-02-22 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2024-02-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-02-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-22 | House | Read a second time |
2024-02-20 | House | Made a special order of business at 11:25 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28 |
2024-02-20 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2024-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation and Local Government, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Representative Emerson withdrawn as a cosponsor |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-11-07 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Local Government |
2023-11-07 | Senate | Introduced |