WI SB617 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-2)
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - Published 4-17-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-2)
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - Published 4-17-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 101.12 (3) (am) 2. and 101.12 (3) (am) 4.; to renumber and amend 101.12 (3) (am) 1., 101.12 (3) (am) 3. and 101.12 (3) (am) 5.; to amend 101.02 (15) (j) and 101.19 (1g) (am); and to create 15.407 (18), 101.02 (7r), 101.023, 101.12 (3) (bq), 101.12 (3m) (d), 101.12 (3r), 101.12 (4) and 101.14 (4r) of the statutes; Relating to: ordinances, variances, and rules relating to the constructing or altering of, or adding to, public buildings and buildings that are places of employment, the creation of a building code council, and inspections of public buildings and buildings that are places of employment, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Ordinances, variances, and rules relating to the constructing or altering of, or adding to, public buildings and buildings that are places of employment, the creation of a building code council, and inspections of public buildings and buildings that are places of employment, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-18 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 82 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 57 N: 38 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 57 N: 38 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Senate | Published 4-17-2014 |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-16-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 270 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-15-2014 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2014-03-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-18 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 82, Noes 13 |
2014-03-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-03-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 57, Noes 38 |
2014-03-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Sinicki, Hulsey, C. Taylor and Young |
2014-03-18 | House | Read a second time |
2014-03-18 | House | Rules suspended and taken up |
2014-03-18 | House | Read |
2014-03-18 | House | Received from Senate |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment 5 laid on table |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment 5 offered by Senators Harris and Carpenter |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment 4 withdrawn and returned to author |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment 4 offered by Senator Erpenbach |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-18-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Public Works, and Telecommunications, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Public Works, and Telecommunications, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate Amendment 3 offered by Senator Harris |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Harris |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Farrow and Moulton |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Public Works, and Telecommunications |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Introduced |