WI SB615 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Published 3-31-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Published 3-31-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 115.7915 (1) (a) and 115.7915 (5) (c); to renumber and amend 115.7915 (4m) (e) 1.; to amend 115.7915 (2) (intro.), 115.7915 (2) (b), 115.7915 (2) (c), 115.7915 (2) (d), 115.7915 (2) (e), 115.7915 (2) (f), 115.7915 (2) (g), 115.7915 (3) (a), 115.7915 (3) (b), 115.7915 (4) (b), 115.7915 (4m) (e) 2., 115.7915 (6) (a) and 115.7915 (6) (h) 2.; to create 115.7915 (2) (h), 115.7915 (4m) (e) 1. a. and 115.7915 (8) (c) of the statutes; and to affect 2015 Wisconsin Act 55, section 9134 (6q) (intro.) and 2015 Wisconsin Act 55, section 9134 (6q) (c); Relating to: special needs scholarship program. (FE)
Title
Special needs scholarship program. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Assembly Amendment 1 concurred in (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in as amended (Y: 56 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 61 N: 33 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 61 N: 33 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - Assembly: Decision of the Chair upheld (Y: 61 N: 33 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in as amended (Y: 56 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 61 N: 33 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 61 N: 33 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - Assembly: Decision of the Chair upheld (Y: 61 N: 33 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | Senate | Published 3-31-2016 |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-30-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 289 |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-29-2016 |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Action ordered immediately messaged |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Assembly Amendment 1 concurred in, Ayes 19, Noes 13 |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-15-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly amended and concurred in as amended, Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2016-02-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-18 | House | Read a third time and concurred in as amended, Ayes 56, Noes 37, Paired 4 |
2016-02-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 61, Noes 33 |
2016-02-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Mason |
2016-02-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2016-02-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 61, Noes 33 |
2016-02-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Pope, Barca and Hebl |
2016-02-18 | House | Decision of the Chair upheld, Ayes 61, Noes 33 |
2016-02-18 | House | Decision of the Chair appealed |
2016-02-18 | House | Point of order that Assembly Amendment 1 not germane under Assembly Rule 54 not well taken |
2016-02-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Vos, Thiesfeldt, Loudenbeck, Murphy, Kitchens and Jagler |
2016-02-18 | House | Read a second time |
2016-02-16 | House | Made a special order of business at 2:43 PM on 2-18-2016 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2016-02-16 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2016-02-16 | House | Received from Senate |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 19, Noes 13 |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 19, Noes 13 |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Read a second time |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Hansen, Wirch, Carpenter, L. Taylor, C. Larson, Ringhand, Vinehout, Miller, Erpenbach, Risser and Shilling |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-16-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 4, Noes 3 |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced |