WI SB615 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Published 6-1-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Published 6-1-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 66.0825 (3) (h) and 196.491 (4) (c) 1.; to amend 30.025 (3m), 66.0303 (3) (a), 66.0825 (3) (e), 66.0825 (3) (f), 66.0825 (4) (a), 66.0825 (18), 196.491 (4) (c) 2., 196.491 (4) (c) 3., 706.09 (3) (a) and 893.33 (5); and to create 196.491 (4) (c) 1g. and 196.491 (4) (c) 1r. a. and b. of the statutes; relating to: exemption for interstate natural gas companies from certain requirements regarding real estate transactions and court actions, creation and powers of municipal electric companies, and exemption from certificate of public convenience and necessity for certain electric transmission line projects.
Title
Exemption for interstate natural gas companies from certain requirements regarding real estate transactions and court actions, creation and powers of municipal electric companies, and exemption from certificate of public convenience and necessity for certain electric transmission line projects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Published 6-1-2010 | |
2010-05-18 | Report approved by the Governor on 5-18-2010. 2009 Wisconsin Act 379 | |
2010-05-13 | Presented to the Governor on 5-13-2010 | |
2010-05-07 | Report correctly enrolled on 5-7-2010 | |
2010-04-23 | Received from Assembly concurred in | |
2010-04-22 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-22 | Read a third time and concurred in | |
2010-04-22 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-22 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-04-22 | Read a second time | |
2010-04-20 | Made a special order of business at 11:54 A.M. on 4-22-2010 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 26 | |
2010-04-16 | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules | |
2010-04-16 | Received from Senate | |
2010-04-15 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-15 | Read a third time and passed | |
2010-04-15 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-15 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-04-15 | Senate amendment 1 adopted | |
2010-04-15 | Read a second time | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on calendar 4-15-2010 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | |
2010-04-07 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-04-07 | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Commerce, Utilities, Energy, and Rail, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | |
2010-04-07 | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by committee on Commerce, Utilities, Energy, and Rail, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | |
2010-04-07 | Executive action taken | |
2010-03-30 | Senate amendment 1 offered by Senator Plale | |
2010-03-23 | Public hearing held | |
2010-03-15 | Read first time and referred to committee on Commerce, Utilities, Energy, and Rail | |
2010-03-15 | Introduced |