WI SB61 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-8)
Status: Passed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Published 4-4-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to repeal 961.55 (1) (d) 1., 961.55 (1) (d) 2., 961.55 (1) (d) 3., 961.55 (1) (d) 4., 961.55 (5) (a), 961.55 (5) (e) 1., 961.55 (5) (e) 2., 973.075 (1) (b) 2m. and 973.075 (5m); to renumber 973.075 (1) (b) 1m. a. to h.; to renumber and amend 961.55 (1) (d) (intro.), 961.55 (5) (e) (intro.) and 973.075 (1) (b) 1m. (intro.); to amend 29.934 (1) (d), 961.55 (1) (intro.), 961.55 (3) (intro.), 961.55 (5) (b), 961.555 (1), 961.555 (2) (a), 961.555 (3), 973.075 (1) (intro.), 973.075 (1) (bg), 973.075 (1) (bm), 973.075 (1) (d), 973.075 (1) (e), 973.075 (4), 973.075 (5) (intro.), 973.076 (1) (a), 973.076 (1) (b) 1. and 973.076 (3); and to create 961.55 (1g), 961.55 (1k), 961.55 (1m), 961.55 (1r), 961.555 (2) (am), 961.555 (3m), 961.555 (5), 961.555 (6), 973.075 (1g), 973.075 (1k), 973.075 (1m), 973.075 (1r), 973.075 (5r), 973.076 (1) (b) 1m., 973.076 (3m), 973.076 (5) and 973.076 (6) of the statutes; Relating to: forfeiture of property seized in relation to a crime. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Forfeiture of property seized in relation to a crime. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-03SenatePublished 4-4-2018
2018-04-03SenateReport approved by the Governor on 4-3-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 211
2018-04-02SenatePresented to the Governor on 4-2-2018
2018-02-26SenateReport correctly enrolled
2018-02-23SenateReceived from Assembly concurred in
2018-02-22HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2018-02-22HouseRead a third time and concurred in
2018-02-22HouseRules suspended
2018-02-22HouseOrdered to a third reading
2018-02-22HouseRead a second time
2018-02-21HouseMade a special order of business at 2:02 PM on 2-22-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28
2018-02-21HouseRead first time and referred to committee on Rules
2018-02-20HouseReceived from Senate
2018-02-20SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2018-02-20SenateRead a third time and passed, Ayes 22, Noes 10
2018-02-20SenateRules suspended
2018-02-20SenateOrdered to a third reading
2018-02-20SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 2 adopted
2018-02-20SenateSenate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 2 adopted
2018-02-20SenateRead a second time
2018-02-16SenatePlaced on calendar 2-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2018-02-16SenateWithdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0
2018-02-16SenateReferred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0
2018-02-05SenateSenate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Senator Craig
2018-01-18SenateLRB correction (Senate Substitute Amendment 2)
2017-09-08SenateAvailable for scheduling
2017-09-08SenateReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform, Ayes 3, Noes 2
2017-09-08SenateReport adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform, Ayes 3, Noes 2
2017-09-07SenateExecutive action taken
2017-09-06SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Senators Craig and Nass
2017-07-05SenateFiscal estimate received
2017-05-30SenatePublic hearing held
2017-05-24SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Craig
2017-05-03SenateFiscal estimate received
2017-03-15SenateFiscal estimate received
2017-03-09SenateFiscal estimate received
2017-02-21SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform
2017-02-21SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback