WI SB61 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 973.075 (1) (b) 2m. b. and 973.075 (2) (intro.); and to create 346.653, 973.075 (1) (b) 1m. h. and 973.075 (1) (b) 2m. bm. of the statutes; Relating to: seizure and forfeiture of motor vehicles used in certain operating-while-intoxicated offenses and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Seizure and forfeiture of motor vehicles used in certain operating-while-intoxicated offenses and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation, Public Safety, and Veterans and Military Affairs |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb61 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/SB61.pdf |