WI SB61 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-26 - Published 6-7-2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-26 - Published 6-7-2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 348.27 (15) (e) of the statutes; relating to: multiple trip permits for overweight vehicles transporting granular roofing material. (FE)
Title
Multiple trip permits for overweight vehicles transporting granular roofing material. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Pamela Galloway [R] | Sen. Jerry Petrowski [R] | Rep. Donna Seidel [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Mursau [R] |
Rep. Richard Spanbauer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-26 | Senate | Published 6-7-2011 |
2011-05-25 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 5-23-2011. 2011 Wisconsin Act 20 |
2011-05-20 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 5-20-2011 |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled on 5-19-2011 |
2011-05-18 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2011-05-17 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2011-05-17 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2011-05-17 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-05-17 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2011-05-17 | House | Read a second time |
2011-05-17 | House | Rules suspended and taken up |
2011-05-17 | House | Read |
2011-05-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Read a second time |
2011-05-16 | Senate | Placed on calendar 5-17-2011 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Report passage recommended by committee on Transportation and Elections, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2011-05-03 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2011-05-03 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation and Elections |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Introduced |