WI SB608 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 118.60 (2) (a) 2. c., 118.60 (3) (ar) 6. (intro.), 118.60 (3) (ar) 6. a. and 118.60 (3) (ar) 6. b.; and to create 118.60 (3) (ar) 6. am., 118.60 (3) (ar) 6. bm. and 118.60 (3) (ar) 6. cm. of the statutes; Relating to: the prior year pupil attendance requirement to participate in the Racine Parental Choice Program or the statewide parental choice program and allowing a pupil who changes residence to transfer from the Racine Parental Choice Program or Milwaukee Parental Choice Program to the statewide parental choice program. (FE)
Title
The prior year pupil attendance requirement to participate in the Racine Parental Choice Program or the statewide parental choice program and allowing a pupil who changes residence to transfer from the Racine Parental Choice Program or Milwaukee Parental Choice Program to the statewide parental choice program. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-25 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | Senate | Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar 5-17-2022 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a) |
2022-04-15 | Senate | Report vetoed by the Governor on 4-15-2022 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-14-2022 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2022-02-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-22 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2022-02-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-22 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-22 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2022-02-17 | House | Placed on calendar 2-22-2022 by Committee on Rules |
2021-12-07 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2021-10-25 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 20, Noes 12 |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-10-22 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-25-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-10-22 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-10-22 | Senate | Representative Wichgers added as a cosponsor |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 4, Noes 3 |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-10-14 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-10-11 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2021-10-11 | Senate | Introduced |