WI SB604 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Published 3-29-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 16.705 (1s), 66.05015, 230.06 (1) (n) and 230.06 (1m) of the statutes; Relating to: fingerprinting and conducting background investigations of employees in the state civil service or of a political subdivision, and of individuals performing contractual services for the state, who have access to federal tax information. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fingerprinting and conducting background investigations of employees in the state civil service or of a political subdivision, and of individuals performing contractual services for the state, who have access to federal tax information. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28SenatePublished 3-29-2018
2018-03-28SenateReport approved by the Governor on 3-28-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 154
2018-03-26SenatePresented to the Governor on 3-26-2018
2018-02-22SenateLRB correction
2018-02-22SenateFiscal estimate received
2018-02-22SenateReport correctly enrolled
2018-02-14SenateReceived from Assembly concurred in
2018-02-13HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2018-02-13HouseRead a third time and concurred in
2018-02-13HouseRules suspended
2018-02-13HouseOrdered to a third reading
2018-02-13HouseRead a second time
2018-02-13HouseRules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
2018-02-08HousePlaced on calendar 2-13-2018 by Committee on Rules
2018-02-07HouseRead first time and referred to committee on Rules
2018-01-23HouseReceived from Senate
2018-01-23SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2018-01-23SenateRead a third time and passed
2018-01-23SenateRules suspended
2018-01-23SenateOrdered to a third reading
2018-01-23SenateSenate Amendment 2 adopted
2018-01-23SenateRead a second time
2018-01-19SenatePlaced on calendar 1-23-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2018-01-17SenateAvailable for scheduling
2018-01-17SenateReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform, Ayes 4, Noes 0
2018-01-17SenateReport adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform, Ayes 4, Noes 0
2018-01-10SenateExecutive action taken
2018-01-17SenateFiscal estimate received
2018-01-04SenatePublic hearing held
2017-12-18SenateFiscal estimate received
2017-12-18SenateSenate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Marklein
2017-12-07SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Marklein
2017-12-07SenateFiscal estimate received
2017-11-30SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform
2017-11-30SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback