WI SB602 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-27)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-27)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.855 (4) (bg) of the statutes; Relating to: the University of Wisconsin Missing-in-Action Recovery and Identification Project and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
The University of Wisconsin Missing-in-Action Recovery and Identification Project and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-03-10 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2022-03-09 | House | Received from Senate |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senators Wanggaard, Darling and Cowles added as coauthors |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 32, Noes 0 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-8-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Representative Moses added as a cosponsor |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Representative Krug added as a cosponsor |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs and Constitution and Federalism, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-12-14 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Representative Knodl added as a cosponsor |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-10-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs and Constitution and Federalism |
2021-10-08 | Senate | Introduced |