WI SB601 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Published 4-4-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Published 4-4-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 87.30 (1) (b); and to create 87.30 (1) (e) of the statutes; Relating to: conforming a floodplain zoning ordinance to a federal letter of map amendment. (FE)
Title
Conforming a floodplain zoning ordinance to a federal letter of map amendment. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lasee [R] | Sen. David Craig [R] | Rep. Adam Jarchow [R] | Rep. Thomas Weatherston [R] |
Rep. Ron Tusler [R] | Rep. Robert Brooks [R] | Rep. Robert Kulp [R] | Rep. John Spiros [R] |
Rep. Tyler Vorpagel [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-03 | Senate | Published 4-4-2018 |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-3-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 242 |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-2-2018 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2018-02-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-22 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2018-02-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-22 | House | Read a second time |
2018-02-20 | House | Made a special order of business at 1:10 PM on 2-22-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 27 |
2018-02-20 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2018-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Craig |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-12-22 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-12-22 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Insurance, Housing and Trade, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance, Housing and Trade |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Introduced |