WI SB601 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 66.0419 of the statutes; Relating to: local regulation of certain containers.
Title
Local regulation of certain containers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Elections and Local Government, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Elections and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Elections and Local Government, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Roth |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Representative Bernier added as a cosponsor |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Roth |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Elections and Local Government |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb601 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB601.pdf |