WI SB600 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 281.36 (3r) (a) 4. and 281.36 (3s); to amend 20.370 (9) (bm), 281.36 (3b) (b), 281.36 (3m) (a), 281.36 (3n) (d), 281.36 (3r) (a) (intro.), 281.36 (3r) (e), 281.36 (4) (title), 281.36 (6) (a) (intro.) and 281.36 (9) (a) (intro.); and to create 281.12 (2), 281.36 (1) (ad), 281.36 (1) (e), 281.36 (3r) (f) and 281.36 (4n) of the statutes; Relating to: permitting and mitigation requirements for nonfederal and artificial wetlands and state assumption of the federal regulatory program governing the discharge of dredged or fill material into navigable waters. (FE)
Title
Permitting and mitigation requirements for nonfederal and artificial wetlands and state assumption of the federal regulatory program governing the discharge of dredged or fill material into navigable waters. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | LRB correction (Senate Substitute Amendment 1) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senators Roth and Cowles |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-12-21 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb600 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB600.pdf |