WI SB60 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 450.035 (2g); to amend 450.03 (1) (f), 450.03 (1) (g), 450.03 (1) (i), 450.035 (2i) (a), 450.035 (2i) (b), 450.035 (2m), 450.035 (2t) (intro.), 450.035 (2t) (a), 450.035 (3) and 450.035 (4); and to create 450.035 (2h) of the statutes; Relating to: pharmacy technicians and pharmacy students administering vaccines.
Title
Pharmacy technicians and pharmacy students administering vaccines.
Sponsors
Sen. Dale Kooyenga [R] | Rep. Joe Sanfelippo [R] | Sen. Rachael Cabral-Guevara [R] | Rep. Barbara Dittrich [R] |
Rep. Cindi Duchow [R] | Rep. Clint Moses [R] | Rep. David Murphy [R] | Rep. Donna Rozar [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Kooyenga |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Kooyenga |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Introduced |