WI SB60 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 973.09 (2) (am); and to amend 48.685 (5) (bm) 4., 48.685 (5) (br) 6., 346.65 (2) (am) 3., 346.65 (2) (am) 4., 346.65 (2) (am) 4m., 346.65 (2) (am) 5., 346.65 (2) (am) 6., 346.65 (2) (am) 7. and 973.09 (2) (a) 1. d. of the statutes; Relating to: penalties for operating-while-intoxicated offenses and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Penalties for operating-while-intoxicated offenses and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation, Public Safety, and Veterans and Military Affairs |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb60 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/SB60.pdf |