WI SB6 | 2018 | January Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-1)
Status: Failed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-1)
Status: Failed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 49.143 (3g) (a) 1., 2., 4., 5. and 6.; to renumber and amend 49.143 (3) and 49.143 (3g) (a) 3.; to consolidate, renumber and amend 49.143 (3g) (a) (intro.) and (b); to amend 49.143 (3) (title); and to create 49.143 (3) (b) and 49.79 (9) (f) of the statutes; Relating to: payments based on performance for Wisconsin Works and FoodShare employment and training program contractors. (FE)
Title
Payments based on performance for Wisconsin Works and FoodShare employment and training program contractors. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Representative Edming added as a cosponsor |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/jr8/sen/bill/sb6 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/JR8/SB6.pdf |