WI SB599 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Published 3-29-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Published 3-29-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 126.01 (20) (a), 126.11 (3) (f), 126.41 (2) (f), 126.44 (1) (c), 126.46 (5m) (a) 1., 126.46 (5m) (a) 2., 126.47 (3) (a) 1., 126.47 (3) (a) 2., 126.56 (3) (f) and 126.88 (1) (c); to renumber 126.41 (9) (a), 126.41 (9) (b) and 126.47 (1) (b) 2.; to renumber and amend 126.41 (9) (intro.), 126.44 (1) (a), 126.44 (1) (b), 126.46 (5m) (a) (intro.), 126.47 (1) (b) 1. (intro.), 126.47 (1) (b) 1. a., 126.47 (1) (b) 1. b., 126.47 (3) (a) (intro.) and 126.48 (3); to consolidate, renumber and amend 126.01 (20) (intro.) and (b); to amend 126.11 (6), 126.11 (9) (intro.), 126.13 (1) (a) 2., 126.13 (1) (b) 2., 126.13 (1) (d), 126.13 (4m), 126.16 (1) (b), 126.16 (1) (c) 1. b., 126.16 (3) (a) (intro.), 126.16 (3) (a) 2., 126.16 (3) (b), 126.26 (5), 126.28 (4m), 126.41 (6) (intro.), 126.44 (1) (d), 126.44 (3), 126.44 (6m), 126.46 (1), 126.47 (3) (b), 126.47 (7) (a) (intro.), 126.47 (7) (am), 126.48 (1), 126.48 (2), 126.56 (9) (intro.), 126.58 (4m) and 126.88 (1) (b); and to create 126.13 (1) (e), 126.16 (3) (am), 126.16 (3) (c), 126.40 (6m), 126.40 (7e) (a) (intro.), 126.40 (7e) (b), 126.41 (6) (ag), 126.41 (6) (ar), 126.41 (6) (br) 4., 126.44 (1) (a) 1., 126.44 (1) (a) 2., 126.44 (1) (b) 1., 126.44 (1) (b) 2., 126.44 (1) (e), 126.47 (1) (ae), 126.47 (3) (ae), 126.47 (3) (c), 126.47 (5m) (title), 126.47 (5m) (a), 126.47 (5m) (b) (intro.), 126.47 (7) (ae), 126.485, 126.56 (2) (c), 126.70 (4) (gm), 126.70 (4) (L) and 126.73 (4) of the statutes; Relating to: various changes to the Agricultural Producer Security Program, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Various changes to the Agricultural Producer Security Program, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Howard Marklein [R] | Sen. Luther Olsen [R] | Rep. Keith Ripp [R] | Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] |
Rep. Ed Brooks [R] | Rep. Robert Brooks [R] | Rep. Cody Horlacher [R] | Rep. Robert Kulp [R] |
Rep. Scott Krug [R] | Rep. Lee Nerison [R] | Rep. Gary Tauchen [R] | Rep. Paul Tittl [R] |
Rep. Ron Tusler [R] | Rep. Nancy VanderMeer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Published 3-29-2018 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-28-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 155 |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-26-2018 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2018-02-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-22 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2018-02-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-22 | House | Read a second time |
2018-02-21 | House | Made a special order of business at 2:05 PM on 2-22-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28 |
2018-02-21 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2018-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Small Business and Tourism, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Small Business and Tourism |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Introduced |