WI SB596 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-05 - Published 4-6-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-05 - Published 4-6-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 20.445 (1) (d), 20.445 (1) (e), 20.445 (1) (fg) and 20.445 (1) (fm); to amend 20.445 (1) (b), 20.445 (1) (bm), 106.05 (2) (b) (intro.), 106.05 (3) (a), 106.13 (1), 106.13 (3m) (b) (intro.), 106.18 and 106.26 (3) (c) (intro.); and to repeal and recreate 106.273 of the statutes; Relating to: consolidation of various appropriations to the Department of Workforce Development for various workforce training programs into a single appropriation to that department for workforce training, restructuring of the career and technical education incentive grant program administered by that department, and making appropriations.
Title
Consolidation of various appropriations to the Department of Workforce Development for various workforce training programs into a single appropriation to that department for workforce training, restructuring of the career and technical education incentive grant program administered by that department, and making appropriations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-18 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-05 | Senate | Published 4-6-2016 |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-5-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 348 |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-4-2016 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2016-02-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-18 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 95, Noes 0 |
2016-02-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-18 | House | Read a second time |
2016-02-16 | House | Made a special order of business at 2:40 PM on 2-18-2016 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2016-02-12 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2016-02-09 | House | Received from Senate |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 32, Noes 0 |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 adopted |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Read a second time |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-9-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Workforce Development, Public Works, and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Workforce Development, Public Works, and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Workforce Development, Public Works, and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Kapenga |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Kapenga |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Workforce Development, Public Works, and Military Affairs |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced |