WI SB596 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 121.58 (6); to amend 121.58 (6) (title); and to create 121.58 (6) (b) of the statutes; relating to: transportation aid to school districts.
Title
Transportation aid to school districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-04-08 | Referred to joint committee on Finance by committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e) | |
2010-04-05 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-04-05 | Report passage recommended by committee on Education, Ayes 6, Noes 1 | |
2010-03-31 | Executive action taken | |
2010-03-25 | Public hearing held | |
2010-03-19 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-03-08 | Read first time and referred to committee on Education | |
2010-03-08 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb596 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/SB596.pdf |