WI SB589 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on April 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-09 - Published 4-9-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on April 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-09 - Published 4-9-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 115.01 (10) (b) and 121.02 (1) (f) 1.; to renumber 115.01 (10) (a); to renumber and amend 121.004 (8), 121.02 (1) (f) 2. and 121.14 (1); to amend 118.04 (4), 118.38 (2) (bm), 118.40 (8) (d) 2., 120.12 (15), 120.12 (27), 121.004 (5), 121.004 (7) (c) 1. a. and b., 121.004 (7) (cm), 121.006 (2) (a), 121.14 (title), 121.14 (2) (a), 121.23 (2) (intro.), 121.58 (4), 121.83 (2) (b) and 121.90 (3); and to create 115.001 (3m), 121.004 (8) (b), 121.14 (1) (a) 2. and 121.14 (1) (a) 3. of the statutes; Relating to: number of school days and hours of instruction held in a school year and state aid for summer classes.
Title
Number of school days and hours of instruction held in a school year and state aid for summer classes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-09 | Senate | Published 4-9-2014 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-8-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 257 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-7-2014 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2014-03-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-18 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2014-03-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-03-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-18 | House | Read a second time |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on calendar 3-18-2014 by Committee on Rules |
2014-03-12 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2014-03-12 | House | Received from Senate |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Point of order that Senate Amendment 3 not germane well taken |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate Amendment 3 offered by Senator Vinehout |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-11-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Vinehout |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Olsen |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Representative Loudenbeck added as a cosponsor |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Representative Murtha added as a cosponsor |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Representative Brooks added as a cosponsor |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Representative Kerkman added as a cosponsor |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Representative Kooyenga added as a cosponsor |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Introduced |