WI SB588 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-06 - Published 12-4-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-06 - Published 12-4-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 601.954 (2) (f) 1., 635.05 (7), 635.12 and 646.51 (3) (ar) 1.; to renumber 632.66; to consolidate, renumber and amend 601.954 (2) (f) (intro.) and 2. and 646.51 (3) (ar) (intro.) and 2.; to amend 601.64 (3) (c), 611.40 (1), 611.42 (1), 611.42 (1e) (b) (intro.), 632.62 (1) (b) 1., 632.62 (1) (b) 2., 645.68 (3), 646.13 (2) (g), 646.325 (2) (intro.), 646.325 (2) (a) (intro.), 655.27 (3) (b) 2., 655.27 (3) (bt) and 655.275 (2); and to create 551.102 (28) (bm), 601.465 (3) (g), 601.465 (3) (h), 601.48 (1m), 611.42 (1b), 611.42 (1g), 611.426, 617.13, 625.03 (1m) (f), 632.62 (1) (b) 4., 632.66 (2), 646.01 (1) (b) 21., 646.01 (1) (b) 22. and 646.325 (2) (a) 3. of the statutes; Relating to: various changes to insurance laws, including issuance of funding agreements, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty.
Title
Various changes to insurance laws, including issuance of funding agreements, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-06 | Senate | Published 12-4-2021 |
2021-12-06 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 12-3-2021. 2021 Wisconsin Act 114 |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 12-2-2021 |
2021-11-15 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2021-11-15 | Senate | LRB correction |
2021-11-12 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2021-11-11 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-11-11 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2021-11-11 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-11-11 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-11-11 | House | Read a second time |
2021-11-11 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2021-11-09 | House | Placed on calendar 11-11-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-11-09 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2021-11-08 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-11-05 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-8-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Insurance, Licensing and Forestry, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Insurance, Licensing and Forestry, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Representative Doyle added as a cosponsor |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Felzkowski |
2021-09-29 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-09-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance, Licensing and Forestry |
2021-09-24 | Senate | Introduced |