WI SB586 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-13 - Published 5-26-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-13 - Published 5-26-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 106.01 (2), 106.01 (4), 106.01 (5) (intro.), 106.01 (5) (a), 106.01 (5) (b), 106.01 (5) (c), 106.01 (5) (e), 106.01 (5) (f), 106.01 (5) (g), 106.01 (5i) (a), 106.01 (5i) (b) and 106.01 (5k); to renumber and amend 15.227 (13), 106.001 (3), 106.01 (3), 106.01 (5) (d), 106.01 (5i) (am) 1., 106.01 (5i) (am) 2., 106.01 (5i) (c), 106.01 (5j), 106.01 (6) and 106.01 (10); to amend 15.157 (15) (a), 15.157 (15) (c), 101.136 (4) (a), 101.136 (6) (a) 1., 101.136 (6) (c) 2., 103.70 (1), 104.08 (2m), 106.001 (1), 106.001 (2), 106.01 (7), 106.01 (8), 106.01 (9), 106.02, 106.025 (2), 106.03, 106.13 (3), 145.01 (3), 145.07 (7) (a), 445.095 (3) and 454.10 (1); to repeal and recreate 106.01 (title); and to create 15.227 (13) (a) 1. to 6. and (b), 106.001 (2m), 106.001 (4), 106.001 (5), 106.001 (6), 106.001 (7), 106.01 (5m) (title), 106.01 (6) (title), 106.01 (6) (d) and 106.01 (11) of the statutes; relating to: apprentice contracts, the appointment and composition of the Wisconsin Apprenticeship Council, requiring the exercise of rule-making authority, and providing a penalty.
Title
Apprentice contracts, the appointment and composition of the Wisconsin Apprenticeship Council, requiring the exercise of rule-making authority, and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-13 | Published 5-26-2010 | |
2010-05-12 | Report approved by the Governor on 5-12-2010. 2009 Wisconsin Act 291 | |
2010-05-11 | Presented to the Governor on 5-11-2010 | |
2010-05-03 | Report correctly enrolled on 5-3-2010 | |
2010-04-21 | Received from Assembly concurred in | |
2010-04-20 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-20 | Read a third time and concurred in | |
2010-04-20 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-20 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-04-20 | Read a second time | |
2010-04-15 | Made a special order of business at 12:05 P.M. on 4-20-2010 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 23 | |
2010-04-15 | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules | |
2010-04-15 | Received from Senate | |
2010-04-15 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-15 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 32, Noes 1 | |
2010-04-15 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-15 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-04-15 | Read a second time | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on calendar 4-15-2010 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | |
2010-04-14 | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e) | |
2010-04-14 | Referred to joint committee on Finance by committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e) | |
2010-04-09 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-04-09 | Report passage recommended by committee on Labor, Elections and Urban Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | |
2010-04-08 | Executive action taken | |
2010-03-16 | Public hearing held | |
2010-03-09 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-03-02 | Read first time and referred to committee on Labor, Elections and Urban Affairs | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced |