WI SB585 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 115.385 (1) (e), 115.385 (1g) (f) and 118.124 of the statutes; Relating to: reporting certain crimes and other incidents that occur on school property or school transportation and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Reporting certain crimes and other incidents that occur on school property or school transportation and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-08 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | Senate | Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar 5-17-2022 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a) |
2022-04-15 | Senate | Report vetoed by the Governor on 4-15-2022 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-14-2022 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2022-02-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-22 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2022-02-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-22 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-22 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2022-02-17 | House | Placed on calendar 2-22-2022 by Committee on Rules |
2021-12-07 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2021-11-08 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 21, Noes 12 |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-11-05 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-8-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 2 |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-10-14 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-10-14 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-09-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2021-09-24 | Senate | Introduced |