WI SB583 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Published 4-4-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Published 4-4-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 551.205 (3); to amend 551.202 (26) (a), 551.202 (26) (b), 551.202 (26) (e), 551.202 (26) (f) 3., 551.202 (26) (h), 551.202 (27) (a), 551.202 (27) (b), 551.202 (27) (g), 551.202 (27) (j), 551.205 (1) (a), 551.205 (1) (b) 2. c., 551.205 (1) (b) 2. d., 551.205 (1) (b) 2. e. and 551.205 (2) (intro.); and to create 551.202 (26m) of the statutes; Relating to: securities registration exemptions related to crowdfunding. (FE)
Title
Securities registration exemptions related to crowdfunding. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. David Craig [R] | Sen. Leah Vukmir [R] | Sen. Duey Stroebel [R] | Rep. Adam Jarchow [R] |
Rep. Joe Sanfelippo [R] | Sen. Dale Kooyenga [R] | Sen. Rob Hutton [R] | Rep. Ron Tusler [R] |
Rep. Evan Goyke [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-03 | Senate | Published 4-4-2018 |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-3-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 213 |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-2-2018 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2018-02-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-22 | House | Representative Barca added as a cosponsor |
2018-02-22 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2018-02-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-22 | House | Read a second time |
2018-02-20 | House | Made a special order of business at 1:08 PM on 2-22-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 27 |
2018-02-20 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2018-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Constitution and Federalism, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Rereferred to committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Constitution and Federalism, by the Senate President, pursuant to Senate Rule 20(1)(c) |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-11-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Financial Services, Constitution and Federalism |
2017-11-20 | Senate | Introduced |