WI SB581 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Published 3-31-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Published 3-31-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 66.0501 (4) of the statutes; Relating to: compatible offices and positions for city, village, and town elective officeholders. (FE)
Title
Compatible offices and positions for city, village, and town elective officeholders. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Cowles [R] | Sen. Van Wanggaard [R] | Sen. Janet Bewley [D] | Sen. Howard Marklein [R] |
Rep. Joel Kitchens [R] | Rep. Michael Rohrkaste [R] | Rep. Robert Kulp [R] | Rep. Adam Jarchow [R] |
Sen. Dan Knodl [R] | Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] | Rep. Alvin Ott [R] | Rep. Ed Brooks [R] |
Rep. Todd Novak [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | Senate | Published 3-31-2016 |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-30-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 341 |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-29-2016 |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Action ordered immediately messaged |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Assembly Amendment 1 concurred in |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-15-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Received from Assembly amended and concurred in as amended, Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2016-02-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-18 | House | Read a third time and concurred in as amended |
2016-02-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2016-02-18 | House | Read a second time |
2016-02-17 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kitchens |
2016-02-16 | House | Made a special order of business at 2:39 PM on 2-18-2016 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2016-02-12 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2016-02-09 | House | Received from Senate |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Read a second time |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-9-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Elections and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Elections and Local Government |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Introduced |