WI SB578 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-5)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-5)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to consolidate, renumber and amend 867.046 (2) (intro.), (a) and (b); and to amend 867.045 (1) (intro.) of the statutes; Relating to: obtaining evidence of the termination of certain property interests of a decedent.
Title
Obtaining evidence of the termination of certain property interests of a decedent.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Local Government, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-11-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Local Government |
2017-11-20 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb578 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB578.pdf |