WI SB577 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-12)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-12)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 40.05 (2) (ar); to amend 40.02 (48) (b) 3., 40.02 (48) (c) and 40.23 (3) (a); and to create 40.02 (17) (n), 40.02 (48) (am) 23., 40.02 (48) (b) 5., 40.05 (1) (a) 7., 40.05 (2) (ap), 40.05 (2) (ar) 2., 40.23 (3) (c), 40.65 (4w), 59.52 (8m) and 111.70 (4) (bn) of the statutes; Relating to: classifying county jailers as protective occupation participants under the Wisconsin Retirement System and the treatment of county jailers under the Municipal Employment Relations Act. (FE)
Title
Classifying county jailers as protective occupation participants under the Wisconsin Retirement System and the treatment of county jailers under the Municipal Employment Relations Act. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Representatives Barca and Vruwink added as cosponsors |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Representatives Kremer and Bowen added as cosponsors |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-11-29 | Senate | Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor |
2017-11-27 | Senate | Report of Joint Survey Committee on Retirement Systems requested |
2017-11-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection |
2017-11-20 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb577 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB577.pdf |