WI SB575 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-25 - Published 4-26-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-25 - Published 4-26-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 45.12 of the statutes; Relating to: official logotypes for Wisconsin veteran-owned businesses and disabled veteran-owned businesses. (FE)
Title
Official logotypes for Wisconsin veteran-owned businesses and disabled veteran-owned businesses. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-25 | Senate | Published 4-26-2016 |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-25-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 384 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-21-2016 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2016-02-16 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-16 | House | Representative Meyers added as a cosponsor |
2016-02-16 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2016-02-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-16 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-16 | House | Read a second time |
2016-02-16 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2016-02-11 | House | Placed on calendar 2-16-2016 by Committee on Rules |
2016-02-11 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2016-02-09 | House | Received from Senate |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 32, Noes 0 |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Read a second time |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-9-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Workforce Development, Public Works, and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Workforce Development, Public Works, and Military Affairs |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Introduced |