WI SB574 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-10)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-10)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 5.84 (1), 6.15 (4) (b), 6.86 (1) (b), 6.87 (6), 6.88 (1) and 7.52 (1) (a); and to create 6.885 and 6.91 of the statutes; Relating to: canvassing absentee ballots on the Monday before an election and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Canvassing absentee ballots on the Monday before an election and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator LeMahieu |
2019-11-22 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Elections, Ethics and Rural Issues |
2019-11-22 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb574 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB574.pdf |