WI SB573 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 22-2)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 22-2)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 66.0440, 84.01 (38), 196.01 (5) (b) 8. and 196.025 (8) of the statutes; Relating to: allowing persons to charge fees for the use of electric vehicle charging stations and the installation and operation of electric vehicle charging stations by the Department of Transportation or a political subdivision.
Title
Allowing persons to charge fees for the use of electric vehicle charging stations and the installation and operation of electric vehicle charging stations by the Department of Transportation or a political subdivision.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Assembly Amendment 1 nonconcurred in (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-03-09 | House | Received from Senate: Assembly Amendment 1 nonconcurred in |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Assembly Amendment 1 nonconcurred in, Ayes 31, Noes 0 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-8-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Received from Assembly amended and concurred in as amended, Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2022-02-24 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-24 | House | Read a third time and concurred in as amended |
2022-02-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-24 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-24 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2022-02-24 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kuglitsch |
2022-02-24 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-24 | House | Representative Armstrong withdrawn as a cosponsor |
2022-02-22 | House | Made a special order of business at 8:30 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2022-02-17 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-15 | House | Received from Senate |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 19, Noes 13 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 3 adopted |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-15-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Utilities, Technology and Telecommunications, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 3 recommended by Committee on Utilities, Technology and Telecommunications, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 3 offered by Senator Cowles |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 to Senate Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Senator Cowles |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Senator Cowles |
2021-12-06 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Senator Cowles |
2021-12-03 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Cowles |
2021-09-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Utilities, Technology and Telecommunications |
2021-09-24 | Senate | Introduced |