WI SB573 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create subchapter XI of chapter 218 [precedes 218.60] of the statutes; Relating to: repair and replacement of implements of husbandry under warranty.
Title
Repair and replacement of implements of husbandry under warranty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation, Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 3 recommended by Committee on Transportation, Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Transportation, Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Senate Amendment 3 offered by Senator Petrowski |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Petrowski |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Petrowski |
2019-11-22 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation, Veterans and Military Affairs |
2019-11-22 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb573 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB573.pdf |