WI SB57 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-04 - Fiscal estimate received
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-04 - Fiscal estimate received
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 949.01 (6), 949.03 (intro.), (1m), (2), (3) and (4) and 949.05; to amend 949.035 (1), 949.04 (3), 949.06 (1) (intro.), 949.06 (3) (intro.), 949.08 (1), (1m) (a) and (2) (a) and (b) and 949.15 (1); and to create 949.01 (6) (b), 949.03 (2m), 949.05 (2m) and 949.06 (3m) of the statutes; Relating to: providing victim compensation for damage to a building by means of fire or explosives. (FE)
Title
Providing victim compensation for damage to a building by means of fire or explosives. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-04 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Representative Knodl added as a cosponsor |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Introduced |