WI SB57 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-19 - Representative L. Myers added as a cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber and amend 125.272 and 125.51 (6); to amend 125.02 (20) and 139.25 (9); and to create 125.07 (1) (b) 7., 125.07 (2) (c), 125.272 (2), 125.51 (6) (b) and 139.11 (1m) of the statutes; Relating to: alcohol beverages delivery and the face-to-face requirement for retail sales of alcohol beverages.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcohol beverages delivery and the face-to-face requirement for retail sales of alcohol beverages.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-19SenateRepresentative L. Myers added as a cosponsor
2021-02-10SenateRepresentative Tranel added as a cosponsor
2021-02-04SenatePublic hearing held
2021-02-03SenateSenators Ballweg and Cowles added as coauthors
2021-02-02SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection
2021-02-02SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback