WI SB563 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 11.1208 (4); and to create 11.1208 (4) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: expressly prohibiting a foreign national from making a contribution to a referendum committee.
Title
Expressly prohibiting a foreign national from making a contribution to a referendum committee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Representative Doyle added as a cosponsor |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Representatives Michalski and Rozar added as cosponsors |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Representative Maxey added as a cosponsor |
2023-11-10 | Senate | Representatives Billings and Madison added as cosponsors |
2023-10-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection |
2023-10-23 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2023/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb563 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2023/REG/SB563.pdf |