WI SB563 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 25 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-11-01 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber and amend 29.875 (1g); to amend 29.011 (3), 29.047 (2) (b), 29.055, 29.057, 29.334 (3), 29.354 (5), 29.357 (5) (b), 29.539 (1m) (d), 29.541 (3), 29.875 (1r), 29.875 (2), 29.885 (1) (f), 29.969, 29.971 (14), 29.974 (2) (a), 77.54 (62), 90.20 (title), 90.20 (2) (intro.), 90.20 (2) (e), 91.01 (20m), 93.73 (1m) (dm), 95.001 (1) (ad) 2., 95.185 (2), 95.25 (1), 95.25 (2), 95.25 (5), 95.26 (5m) (a), 95.26 (5m) (b), 95.26 (7), 95.30, 95.31 (3), 95.31 (4), 95.33, 95.40 (1), 95.41 (2), 95.42, 95.51 (1), 95.51 (2) (a) 1., 95.55 (title), 95.55 (1) (a), 95.55 (1) (b) 1., 95.55 (1) (b) 2., 95.55 (1) (c) (intro.), 95.55 (1) (c) 1., 95.55 (3) (b) 1., 95.55 (3) (b) 3., 95.55 (3m) (a), 95.55 (3m) (b), 95.55 (4), 95.55 (5) (a), 95.55 (5) (b), 95.55 (5) (bn) 1., 95.55 (5) (bn) 2., 95.55 (5) (c), 95.55 (6) (a), 95.55 (6) (b) 1., 95.68 (1) (d), 95.80 (1) (b), 97.42 (1) (bg), 97.42 (1) (em), 97.42 (3) (em), 97.42 (4) (em), 97.44 (3), 100.04 (1), 169.01 (7), 174.001 (3) and 943.76 (1) (a); and to create 29.001 (25s), 29.875 (1g) (b), 90.20 (1) (am), 95.001 (1) (aim), 97.42 (1) (ds), 169.01 (12s) and 951.09 (3) (cm) of the statutes; Relating to: farm-raised game bovids. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Farm-raised game bovids. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-10-25 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-01HouseFiscal estimate received
2021-10-25HouseReceived from Senate
2021-10-25SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2021-10-25SenateRead a third time and passed, Ayes 20, Noes 12
2021-10-25SenateRules suspended
2021-10-25SenateOrdered to a third reading
2021-10-25SenateSenate Amendment 1 adopted
2021-10-25SenateRead a second time
2021-10-22SenatePlaced on calendar 10-25-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2021-10-21SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Testin
2021-10-21SenateAvailable for scheduling
2021-10-21SenateReport passage recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Small Business and Rural Issues, Ayes 3, Noes 2
2021-10-21SenateExecutive action taken
2021-10-19SenatePublic hearing held
2021-10-19SenateFiscal estimate received
2021-10-12SenateRepresentative James added as a cosponsor
2021-10-05SenateSenator Jacque added as a coauthor
2021-09-29SenateFiscal estimate received
2021-09-27SenateRepresentative Wichgers added as a cosponsor
2021-09-23SenateRepresentative Knodl added as a cosponsor
2021-09-15SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage, Small Business and Rural Issues
2021-09-15SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback