WI SB560 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Passed on March 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-07 - Published 3-5-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Passed on March 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-07 - Published 3-5-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 70.11 (2) of the statutes; Relating to: property tax exemption for regional planning commissions. (FE)
Title
Property tax exemption for regional planning commissions. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Senate | Published 3-5-2022 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-4-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 151 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-3-2022 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2022-01-25 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-01-25 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2022-01-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-01-25 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-01-25 | House | Read a second time |
2022-01-25 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from Senate message and take up |
2022-01-25 | House | Read |
2022-01-25 | House | Received from Senate |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-25-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2021-11-29 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Petrowski |
2021-10-14 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-10-14 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-09-22 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-09-22 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-09-15 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Local Government |
2021-09-15 | Senate | Introduced |