WI SB56 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Published 4-17-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Published 4-17-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 941.29 (4m) (a) 2.; to amend 941.29 (4m) (a) (intro.); and to create 941.29 (4m) (a) 2. (intro.), b. and c. of the statutes; Relating to: mandatory minimum incarceration period following illegal possession of a firearm.
Title
Mandatory minimum incarceration period following illegal possession of a firearm.
Sponsors
Sen. Leah Vukmir [R] | Sen. Van Wanggaard [R] | Sen. Alberta Darling [R] | Sen. Steve Nass [R] |
Sen. Dan Feyen [R] | Rep. Joe Sanfelippo [R] | Sen. John Jagler [R] | Rep. Cody Horlacher [R] |
Rep. David Murphy [R] | Rep. Cindi Duchow [R] | Rep. Ron Tusler [R] | Rep. Bob Gannon [R] |
Rep. Jim Ott [R] | Rep. John Spiros [R] | Rep. Paul Tittl [R] | Rep. Kenneth Skowronski [R] |
Rep. Jesse Kremer [R] | Rep. Ed Brooks [R] | Rep. Scott Allen [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-11-07 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Senate | Published 4-17-2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-16-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 310 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-12-2018 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2018-02-21 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-21 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2018-02-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-21 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-21 | House | Read a second time |
2018-02-15 | House | Made a special order of business at 2:21 PM on 2-20-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 26 |
2018-02-15 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2017-11-07 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 29, Noes 4 |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Read a second time |
2017-11-03 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-7-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-10-11 | Senate | Senator Craig added as a coauthor |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Introduced |