WI SB557 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 20.445 (1) (fc), 49.1635 (1), 49.1635 (2), 49.1635 (3), 49.1635 (4) and 106.15; to renumber and amend 49.1635 (5) (a), 49.1635 (5) (b) and 49.1635 (5) (c); to amend 16.306 (2) (a), 16.3085 (2) (b) 2., 38.40 (2), 46.56 (14) (a), 49.143 (2) (a) 4m. e., 49.163 (4) (intro.), 49.175 (1) (j), 49.175 (1) (k), 49.265 (1) (b), 49.265 (3) (b) 11., 49.265 (4) (a), 49.265 (4) (b), 49.265 (4) (c), 49.79 (9) (a) 1., 60.85 (7) (a), 60.85 (7) (b), 66.1103 (6m), 66.1105 (6c) (a), 66.1105 (6c) (b), 71.07 (2dx) (a) 5., 71.07 (5r) (b) 2., 71.28 (1dx) (a) 5., 71.28 (5r) (b) 2., 71.47 (1dx) (a) 5., 71.47 (5r) (b) 2., 76.636 (1) (e) 12., 85.20 (4m) (a) 8. b., 106.11, 106.13 (2), 106.16 (2), 106.27 (1m), 109.07 (1m) (a), 115.28 (24), 238.30 (4m) and 946.13 (10); and to create 13.48 (26m), 16.03 (2) (d), 16.19, 16.3065, 20.320 (2) (a), 20.435 (5) (em), 20.437 (2) (cs), 20.437 (2) (eg), 20.445 (1) (fc), 20.505 (7) (bq), 20.505 (7) (e), 20.505 (7) (fk), 36.25 (56), 46.483, 49.168, 49.175 (1) (x), 49.45 (31m), 49.675, 51.44 (5) (bm), 106.115, 115.28 (66), 234.253 and 281.61 (8) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: housing and homelessness; emergency rental assistance program; indigent civil legal services; workforce development; community action agencies; poverty reports; mental health; economic security; reimbursement for nonemergency medical transportation services; urban mass transit aid; lead exposure and abatement services; lead service line replacement; providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures; granting rule-making authority; and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Housing and homelessness; emergency rental assistance program; indigent civil legal services; workforce development; community action agencies; poverty reports; mental health; economic security; reimbursement for nonemergency medical transportation services; urban mass transit aid; lead exposure and abatement services; lead service line replacement; providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures; granting rule-making authority; and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-12-01 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-11-21 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-11-20 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-11-16 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-11-09 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-11-08 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-10-26 | Senate | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor |
2023-10-24 | Senate | Representative Clancy added as a cosponsor |
2023-10-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Housing, Rural Issues and Forestry |
2023-10-23 | Senate | Introduced |