WI SB557 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 779.415 (1c), 779.43 (3) and 779.48 (2); and to create 779.41 (4) and 779.413 of the statutes; Relating to: liens on aircraft and aircraft engines.
Title
Liens on aircraft and aircraft engines.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Trade, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Trade, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Feyen |
2019-12-04 | Senate | Representative Wittke added as a cosponsor |
2019-12-04 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-11-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Trade |
2019-11-08 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb557 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB557.pdf |