WI SB554 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on November 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-17 - Published 11-17-2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on November 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-17 - Published 11-17-2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: ratification of the agreement negotiated between the state of Wisconsin and the Wisconsin Law Enforcement Association, for the 2023-25 biennium, covering employees in the public safety collective bargaining unit, and authorizing an expenditure of funds. (FE)
Title
Ratification of the agreement negotiated between the state of Wisconsin and the Wisconsin Law Enforcement Association, for the 2023-25 biennium, covering employees in the public safety collective bargaining unit, and authorizing an expenditure of funds. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-11-07 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-07 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-07 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-17 | Senate | Published 11-17-2023 |
2023-11-17 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 11-16-2023. 2023 Wisconsin Act 38 |
2023-11-15 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 11-15-2023 |
2023-11-13 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2023-11-08 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2023-11-07 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-11-07 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 95, Noes 3 |
2023-11-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-11-07 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2023-11-07 | House | Read a second time |
2023-11-07 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from Senate message and take up |
2023-11-07 | House | Read |
2023-11-07 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-11-07 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-11-07 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 31, Noes 0 |
2023-11-07 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2023-11-07 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2023-11-07 | Senate | Read a second time |
2023-11-03 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-7-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2023-11-02 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-10-23 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2023-10-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Senate Organization |
2023-10-23 | Senate | Introduced |