WI SB554 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 13.48 (3), 13.48 (6), 13.48 (7), 13.48 (10) (a), 13.48 (10) (b) 5., 13.48 (29), 13.488 (7) (a), 16.855 (14) (am), 16.855 (22), 16.87 (3), 20.924 (1) (a) and 20.924 (1) (b); and to create 16.855 (1g) (ec), 16.855 (1g) (em), 16.855 (14s) and 16.867 of the statutes; Relating to: projects included in the Authorized State Building Program, project approvals by the Building Commission, and selection of project architects and engineers. (FE)
Title
Projects included in the Authorized State Building Program, project approvals by the Building Commission, and selection of project architects and engineers. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Representative Brostoff added as a cosponsor |
2017-12-22 | Senate | Representative Genrich added as a cosponsor |
2017-12-22 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-11-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection |
2017-11-20 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb554 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB554.pdf |